Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to grant an absolute divorce on the ground of separation of affection if the parties are not engaging in sexual relations under certain circumstances.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0336 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {452319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-23)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {452319/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-23) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page