Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Korman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain whistleblower protections for certain employees of the State apply to the employees of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority contingent on certain action by the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia; specifying certain whistleblower protection laws that the General Assembly considers similar for the purpose of a certain provision of law; establishing the intent of the General Assembly to waive the sovereign immunity of the State for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {974161/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM