Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting a spouse or financially dependent child of an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State under certain circumstances; clarifying that the exemption for certain honorably discharged veterans of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education applies to a veteran honorably discharged at any time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/6/2021 10:40 AM
Click to return on the top page