Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, when sentencing a minor convicted as an adult, to impose a sentence less than the minimum term; prohibiting a court from imposing a sentence of life without the possibility of parole or release for a minor; authorizing a certain individual convicted as an adult for an offense committed as a minor to file a motion to reduce the duration of the sentence; requiring the court to conduct a hearing on a motion to reduce the sentence; requiring that notice of the hearing be given to the victim or the victim's representative; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0494
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial and Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {622815/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/30 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {103128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (52-82)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {443920/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (53-82)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {453523/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {613727/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (53-78)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {813928/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (52-81)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {263925/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (54-77)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (54-79)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-48)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Text - Racial and Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {622815/1 Adopted 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Motion Special Order until 03/30 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {103128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (52-82) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {443920/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (53-82) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {453523/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (51-83) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {613727/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (53-78) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {813928/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (52-81) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {263925/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (54-77) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (54-79) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (86-48) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Rules 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Age
(   6-235, 8-110 )
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 11:01 AM
Click to return on the top page