Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Feldmark, and Lierman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an open investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with, if the officer knew or should have known that the person is a victim, witness, or suspect, is requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties, or is in the custody of the officer; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0043
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/21/2020
Legislative Date
9/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422119/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-36)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/21/2020 9/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {422119/1 Adopted 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (98-36) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:36 PM
Click to return on the top page