Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Increased Voter Participation
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Increased Voter Participation to evaluate and identify policies that have the potential to increase voter participation, evaluate the impact of any policy changes on the integrity of the electoral process, and estimate the costs of implementing policy changes to the State and local boards of elections; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Increased Voter Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study Increased Voter Participation
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2021 12:23 PM
Click to return on the top page