Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate Belcastro
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health establish certain training and staffing requirements for Alzheimer's special care units in assisted living programs; and requiring the Department to convene interested stakeholders by December 1, 2022, to make revisions to certain regulations and adopt regulations for assisted living programs that incorporate the requirements for Alzheimer's special care units as provided in the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0204
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {246186/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {246186/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page