Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Schools - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that certain public schools be open for at least 180 days and a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year to require that the schools be open for at least 180 days or a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year; and providing that certain funding for schools may not be reduced if there are fewer than 1,080 school hours under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0019 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public Schools - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Public Schools - Required Number of School Days or Hours
House 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 4:00 PM
Click to return on the top page