Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering references to the term "clean energy" to be "advanced clean energy" for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the Maryland Clean Energy Center and the Maryland Energy Innovation Institute; altering certain findings of the General Assembly, the purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the development of clean energy industries in the State, and the purposes, powers, and duties of the Center and Institute to include certain actions supporting clean energy innovation; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0460
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2020
Legislative Date
8/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-39)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 8/19/2020 8/19/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-39) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 11:23 AM
Click to return on the top page