Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence in order to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more people at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0139
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1807 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM