Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Buckel, Feldmark, Ivey, Szeliga, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public safety officer" to include certain public safety officers employed full time by a State public safety agency and certain volunteer reserve officers for purposes of a certain property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM