Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for fiscal year 2022, the Comptroller to distribute $100,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to the University of Maryland School of Law, the University of Baltimore School of Law, and the Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; requiring the Comptroller to administer the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0480
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/10/2020
Legislative Date
7/10/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675362/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-12)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/10/2020 7/10/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {675362/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (123-12) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 21 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-206, 2-608.2, 2-609   )
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page