Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a certain prohibited act with the intent to interrupt or impair the functioning of a health care facility or a public school; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing certain ransomware with the intent to use the ransomware for purposes of introduction into a computer, network, or system of another person; providing a penalty for violation of the Act of 2 years of imprisonment and up to a $5,000 fine or both; authorizing a victim of a certain offense to bring a civil action for damages; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0623
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642616/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558978/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {642616/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {558978/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page