Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with the State Board of Elections and the Maryland Association of Election Officials, to study the requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring a certain analysis to include information on the administrative, technological, legal, security, and fiscal requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM