Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Cain, Chang, Corderman, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Hill, Jackson, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Miller, Patterson, Pendergrass, Terrasa, Acevero, Anderton, Boyce, Bridges, Gaines, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jones, Krimm, Lehman, Lierman, Love, McKay, Proctor, Solomon, Stein, Valentino-Smith, Wells, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the policy and purpose of provisions of law governing flood control and watershed management to include establishing a grant program to assist local jurisdictions with infrastructure repairs, watershed restoration, and emergency protection work associated with a flood event; authorizing the Department of the Environment to use the comprehensive flood management grant program to award grants to subdivisions that incurred infrastructure damage of least $1,000,000 caused by a flood event on or after January 1, 2009; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {200818/2 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {523224/1 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-31)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {859436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {200818/2 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Floor Amendment {523224/1 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {859436/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (116-21) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Text - Chapter - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-801, 5-802, 5-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM