Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer or a nonrefillable container permit for draft beer to a holder of a Class H beer and wine license if the licensed establishment is in Damascus.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:31 PM
Click to return on the top page