Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, Norman, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from requiring, as a condition of employment or continued employment, an employee or a prospective employee to join or remain a member of a labor organization, pay charges to a labor organization, or pay a specified amount to a third party under specified circumstances; prohibiting an employer from threatening an employee or a prospective employee with specified action; providing that a specified violation of law is a misdemeanor and is subject to specified penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0318 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-414.1, 6-407, 6-504 )
(   5-595.3 )
(   4-304, 4-701 through 4-707 )
(   16-309, 16-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM