Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an annual appropriation of $3,000,000 to be used for branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that extend operating hours and services above those in effect as of January 1, 2016; declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to utilize increased operating hours and services to advance the library's commitment to equity, inclusion, and greater access to library resources, programs, and services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-26)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (107-26) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Text - Chapter - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page