Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Acevero, Barron, Bridges, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Ivey, Korman, Lehman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Shetty, Stewart, Turner, Wells, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Imposing a tax of 17% on the Maryland taxable income attributable to certain investment management services of an individual or a corporation or the distributive share of a pass-through entity; providing that the tax does not apply to investment management services if at least 80% of the specified assets consists of real estate; terminating the Act if certain federal legislation is enacted into law; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0216
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0926 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:26 AM