Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington and Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a school administrator or official or a school safety coordinator from directing a school resource officer to enforce certain discipline-related policies, rules, regulations, or procedures; prohibiting a school resource officer from unilaterally enforcing certain discipline-related policies, rules, regulations, or procedures; requiring a specialized curriculum for use in training of school resource officers to include training in conduct that is prohibited; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {975968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-8)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {975968/1 Adopted 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-8) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM