Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to convene a task force to study and make recommendations on the adoption of a unique Maryland Identification Number for each registered or licensed business in the State to be used by certain State agencies; requiring the task force to include representatives of certain State agencies; authorizing the task force to include representatives of certain other State agencies; providing for the duties of the task force; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {165160/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Text - Chapter - Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page