Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Afzali, Bates, Boteler, Cluster, DeBoy, Elliott, Frank, Glass, Hough, Impallaria, Ivey, Jameson, Kipke, Krebs, Love, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, Ready, B. Robinson, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Stukes, Szeliga, Vitale, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the limitation on the amount of specified military retirement income that may be subtracted from federal adjusted gross income for Maryland income tax purposes; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0112 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM