Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - List of Tangible Personal Property and Services - Publication
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to publish on the Comptroller's website a comprehensive list of tangible personal property and services the sale or use of which is subject to the sales and use tax; and requiring the Comptroller to update the list at least quarterly and detail any additions, deletions, or revisions to the list.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - List of Tangible Personal Property and Services - Publication
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - List of Tangible Personal Property and Services - Publication
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - List of Tangible Personal Property and Services - Publication
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM