Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Bromwell, Cluster, Kittleman, Moon, Valentino-Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions in a contract or an agreement relating to architectural, engineering, inspecting, or surveying services that purport to require the promisor or indemnitor to defend or pay the costs of defending specified promisees or indemnitees against liability for specified damages are against public policy and are void and unenforceable under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0387
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1302 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM