Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Bromwell, Buckel, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Grammer, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the General Assembly and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Commission; requiring the Commission to divide the State to create General Assembly and congressional districts, as specified; providing for the membership, qualifications, and duties of the Commission; specifying requirements for the adoption of redistricting plans; requiring the Legislative Auditor to establish and administer an application process for individuals seeking appointment to the Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM