Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Angel, Conaway, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, M. Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim or victim's family member to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification; providing that, for the purpose of the Act, a victim shall be considered to be helpful, to have been helpful, or likely to be helpful to the detection, investigation, or prosecution of a qualifying criminal activity; requiring the certifying official to sign and complete the certification in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1208 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-47) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {528879/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-930, 11-931 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM