Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Cassilly, and Johnson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for low speed electric vehicles in the City of Havre de Grace; defining a "low speed electric vehicle" as a vehicle capable of a sustained speed of 20 miles per hour but not more than 25 miles per hour; providing that a person who operates a low speed electric vehicle in the City of Havre de Grace may operate the vehicle only on certain roadways and, between dusk and dawn, only if the low speed electric vehicle is equipped with certain lighting devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0389
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-130.1, 13-402, 21-104.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM