Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from the American Dental Association to the National Commission on Recognition of Dental Specialties and Certifying Boards, the entity whose requirements regarding specialties an applicant for a teacher's license to practice dentistry must meet under certain circumstances; providing that certain qualifications required for applicants for Board recognition as a specialist may include requirements established by certain specialty certification boards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-302, 4-504 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:51 PM