Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Payment of Wages
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Frederick County to pay the wages of a county employee by debit card and to require a county employee to elect to receive the payment of wages by debit card or, subject to specified provisions of law, by direct deposit as a condition of employment; and requiring the county, under specified circumstances, to provide specified employees with a specified statement.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383492/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777173/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {383492/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {777173/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 53
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM