Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
Sponsored by
Queen Anne's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a beauty salon and barbershop beer and wine license in Queen Anne's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to holders of certain beauty salon or barbershop permits; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer or wine by the glass for on-premises consumption to a customer receiving cosmetology or barbering services; prohibiting a customer from consuming more than 5 ounces of wine or 12 ounces of beer during any one visit; providing a $100 annual license fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0428
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {363094/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-1001, 27-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM