Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce may approve; and applying the Act to all Maryland research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0211
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0488 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page