Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Corporation Returns - Filing Date
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending by 1 month the date by which specified corporations must complete and file with the Comptroller an income tax return; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0288
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915669/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {915669/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Returned Passed 55A
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-821 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM