Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Fennell, W. Fisher, J. Lewis, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, in a county that has fixed-route public transportation service, each early voting center must be located not more than one-quarter mile from a public transportation station or stop.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM