Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Student Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Fennell, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain business entities a credit against the State income tax for the cost of hiring student employees who attend a high school at which at least 80% of the registered students are eligible for the federal free or reduced price meal program and who work for the business entity for at least 3 months and at least 20 hours each week during the employment period; providing that the credit may not exceed $5,000 for any taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0909 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Student Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Student Employees
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM