Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Fraser-Hidalgo, Barkley, Carr, Gutierrez, Jalisi, Korman, Lam, Luedtke, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, and Sophocleus
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs paid or incurred by a taxpayer that installs an energy storage system and who obtains a tax credit certificate from the Maryland Energy Administration; requiring the Administration to issue tax credits not to exceed specified amounts; prohibiting the Administration from issuing an aggregate amount of tax credit certificates exceeding $750,000 in a taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0758
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0386 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-3)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {825669/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-3) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-719 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM