Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Hettleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the determination of the jurisdictional law governing the meaning and effect of the terms of a trust under the Maryland Trust Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0267
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 39
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM