Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding the Somerset County Economic Development Commission as an eligible governmental unit in the Employees' Pension System; providing that specified individuals are subject to the alternate contributory pension benefit in the Employees' Pension System in the same manner as specified other individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434968/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {434968/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-221, 31-102, 31-111, 31-111.7, 31-116.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM