Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Barron, Corderman, Holmes, McComas, Grammer, Hartman, R. Watson, Arikan, Cox, and Malone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a person who solicits another or conspires with another to commit murder in the first degree is guilty of murder in the first degree if the death of another occurs as a result of the solicitation or conspiracy.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0778 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882617/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {882617/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text - Chapter - Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM