Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of assistant sheriffs in Calvert County who were active duty deputy sheriffs immediately before appointment to be set by the County Commissioners of Calvert County; requiring the County Commissioners to include a certain cost of living adjustment in a certain assistant sheriff's salary under certain circumstances; prohibiting the County Commissioners from reducing a certain assistant sheriff's salary without cause; and authorizing the Sheriff to negotiate a certain assistant sheriff's salary.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM