Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, beginning with the revenue estimate for fiscal year 2020, to calculate a specified share of General Fund revenues represented by specified nonwithholding income tax revenues; requiring the Bureau to make a specified adjustment to a specified revenue estimate relating to nonwithholding income tax revenues under specified circumstances; establishing the Fiscal Responsibility Fund to retain the amount of nonwithholding income tax revenues until the revenues are appropriated in the State budget; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444267/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {444267/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text - Chapter - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-104 through 6-106, 7-311, 7-329, 7-330 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM