Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Fennell, Glenn, Hornberger, and Jameson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0468
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1440 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate West) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683920/1 (Delegate West) Rejected (51-87)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-49)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate West) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Floor Amendment {683920/1 (Delegate West) Rejected (51-87) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (86-49) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Finance 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page