Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Bartlett, Feldmark, Fennell, Kelly, Lehman, Lopez, Proctor, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report certain information regarding the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2019, and each year thereafter; and requiring the Department, in producing the report, to consult with the Maryland Alliance for the Poor, local health departments, MedChi, the American Academy of Pediatrics Maryland Chapter, the Mid-Atlantic Association of Community Mental Health Centers, and other stakeholders.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0970
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104265/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {104265/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Rules 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page