Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition Exemption for Military Personnel, Spouses, and Dependents - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Arikan, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Brooks, Chang, Cox, Crosby, Hettleman, Hornberger, Howard, Impallaria, M. Jackson, Krebs, Lehman, Long, McComas, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Saab, Solomon, R. Watson, Wilson, P. Young, and Griffith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 228
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting spouses and financially dependent children of active duty members of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State if certain requirements are met at the time of acceptance to attend the institution; and requiring the exemption to continue if the qualifying individual enrolls and remains continuously enrolled at the institution, and remains domiciled in the State regardless of changes in the station, residency, or domicile of the active duty member.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 228
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition Exemption for Military Personnel, Spouses, and Dependents - Alterations
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {574869/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition Exemption for Military Personnel, Spouses, and Dependents - Alterations
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 228
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition Exemption for Military Personnel, Spouses, and Dependents - Alterations
(   10-101, 15-106.4 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page