Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a dealer in Baltimore County or Harford County to sell, barter, deliver, give away, show, or offer for sale a motorcycle or certificate of title for a motorcycle on Sunday.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283399/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {483222/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted (36-9)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {283399/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Floor Amendment {483222/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted (36-9) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM