Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, in Montgomery County, the Montgomery County Board of Education may utilize a school bus with doors that lock to transport students in the county if the school bus' locking system prevents the school bus from being operated when any bus exit is locked.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105468/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {105468/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM