Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Stein, and Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Agriculture from certifying and registering a site that will be used to grow or cultivate hemp under the Hemp Research Pilot Program if the area on which the hemp will be grown is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences; and prohibiting the Department from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp in the State if the area on which the hemp will be produced is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0964
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 9:21 AM