Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Arentz, Jacobs, Mautz, and Rose
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the county boards of education in Caroline, Dorchester, Kent, Queen Anne's, and Talbot counties to establish a regional Career and Technology Education (CTE) school to provide career and technology education programs to public high school students in the counties; requiring a regional CTE school to operate under the terms of a certain collective bargaining agreement; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula for certain county boards of education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {985868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {985868/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM