Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Data Request Exemption – Surgical Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Cullison, Ebersole, Krimm, Lam, Morhaim, and Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to exempt a prescriber from being required to request certain data from the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program if the opioid or benzodiazepine is prescribed or dispensed to an individual to treat or prevent acute pain for not more than 14 days following any surgical procedure, rather than only surgical procedures in which general anesthesia was used; and making the Act subject to a certain contingency.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296184/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Drug Monitoring Program - Data Request Exemption - Regional Anesthesia Patients
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {296184/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Pharmacy Drug Monitoring Program – Data Request Exemption – Surgical Procedures
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Finance 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {987472/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Data Request Exemption – Surgical Procedures
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Text - Chapter - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Data Request Exemption – Surgical Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-04.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM