Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Former Legislators - Lobbying
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lam, A. Miller, and S. Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a former member of the General Assembly from assisting or representing another party for compensation in a matter that is the subject of legislative action until the later of the conclusion of the next regular session that begins after the member leaves office or six months after the date that the campaign finance entity of the member makes a transfer to another campaign committee; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM