Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Jones, Bagnall, Boyce, Bridges, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Feldmark, Glenn, Hettleman, Ivey, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Palakovich Carr, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Solomon, Valderrama, Wells, Brooks, Bartlett, Terrasa, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $100,000 in the annual budget beginning in fiscal year 2021 for the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund; establishing the Task Force on Maryland Maternal and Child Health; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations, including programs that the Maryland Medical Assistance Program should implement; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0406
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566985/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {566985/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {297770/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text - Chapter - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page